Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Blas Jacobo Beltrán

Deceased

Bishop of Coria, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1746Born
26 Jun 180558.9AppointedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
6 Oct 180559.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ibiza, Spain
10 Jul 181568.9AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
28 Apr 182174.7DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Blas Jacobo Beltrán
Bishop Blas Jacobo Beltrán (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuesma

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,805, Number 31
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 143, and Page 221
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 126, Number 669

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast