Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aldo Mongiano, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1919Born
3 Jun 194323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
14 May 197555.5AppointedPrelate of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil
14 May 197555.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasai
5 Oct 197555.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasai
26 May 197858.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Nasai
4 Dec 197960.0AppointedBishop of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil
26 Jun 199676.6RetiredBishop of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil
15 Apr 2020100.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aldo Mongiano
Bishop Aldo Mongiano I.M.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Roraima

EventPlace
Birth PlacePontestura, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Philippe, Casale Monferrato, Diocese of Casale Monferrato, Italy
Death PlaceMoncalvo, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Cemetery, Pontestura, Italy

  • a priest for 76.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 16 Apr 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,991

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast