Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Arana Cuesta

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1663Born
26 Jan 172864.5AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
18 Apr 172864.7Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
23 Feb 173975.5DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Arana Cuesta
Bishop Jacinto Arana Cuesta (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanalejas de Arroyo

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 46, Number 182
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,728, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 422

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast