Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Leonini

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1774BornRecanati
24 Sep 180026.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 180026.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 181642.0AppointedBishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
28 Jul 181642.0Ordained BishopBishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
9 Apr 182247.7DiedBishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Leonini:
Bishop Francesco Leonini (born , died ) Bishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado

  • a priest for 21.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013