Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Francesco Carnevale

Deceased

Bishop of Tortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1757Born
23 Sep 178022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Tortona, Italy
10 Oct 181860.8SelectedBishop of Tortona, Italy
21 Dec 181861.0ConfirmedBishop of Tortona, Italy
14 Feb 181961.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
29 Oct 183173.9DiedBishop of Tortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Francesco Carnevale
Bishop Carlo Francesco Carnevale (born , died ) Bishop of Tortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTortona, Diocese of Tortona

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 175
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Jun 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,464
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,819, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast