Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ángel Javier Pérez Pueyo

Bishop of Barbastro-Monzón


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1956 BornEjea de los Caballeros
19 Mar 198023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Zaragoza, Spain
27 Dec 201458.3AppointedBishop of Barbastro-Monzón, Spain
22 Feb 201558.5Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro-Monzón, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ángel Javier Pérez Pueyo:
Bishop Ángel Javier Pérez Pueyo (born ) Bishop of Barbastro-Monzón

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barbastro-Monzón.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2014
  • ob/opd: CB, 27 Dec 2014
  • c2+: CB, 3 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015