Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Gouvea, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹BornBeja
4 Jun 159116.4ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
19 Aug 161136.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
8 Jan 161237.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
18 Aug 162853.6DiedTitular Bishop of Cyrene

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Gouvea:
Bishop Antonio de Gouvea O.S.A. (died ) Titular Bishop of Cyrene

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,204
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 171
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 128, Number 815

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014