Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Evangelist McBride, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kokstad, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1903Born
3 Jul 192724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Apr 194946.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kokstad, South Africa
21 Apr 194946.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aezani
25 Jul 194946.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aezani
11 Jan 195147.8AppointedBishop of Kokstad, South Africa
15 May 197875.1RetiredBishop of Kokstad, South Africa
12 Feb 199187.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Kokstad, South Africa

MicroData Summary for John Evangelist McBride
Bishop John Evangelist McBride O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kokstad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeagh, Ireland

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast