Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sabbatino Giani

Deceased

Bishop of Livorno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1858Born
22 May 188022.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 190042.7AppointedBishop of Livorno, Italy
21 Dec 190042.7Ordained BishopBishop of Livorno, Italy
18 Feb 192162.9DiedBishop of Livorno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sabbatino Giani
Bishop Sabbatino Giani (born , died ) Bishop of Livorno

EventPlace
Birth PlacePonte a Cappiano

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast