Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ildefonso Cañedo y Vigil

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1760BornGrullos de Cándamo
1792¹32.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 181454.6SelectedBishop of Málaga, Spain
19 Dec 181454.9ConfirmedBishop of Málaga, Spain
19 Feb 181555.1Ordained BishopBishop of Málaga, Spain
1 Mar 182565.1SelectedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
27 Jun 182565.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
21 Sep 182969.7DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ildefonso Cañedo y Vigil:
Archbishop Ildefonso Cañedo y Vigil (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 122, and Page 250
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 130, Number 697

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013