Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Polikarp Antoni Augustyn Marciejewski, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów

Titular Bishop of Argos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1761BornKretingae
1779¹17.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Feb 178423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
4 Jun 181958.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
4 Jun 181958.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Argos
19 Sep 181958.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Argos
19 Oct 182766.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Polikarp Antoni Augustyn Marciejewski:
Bishop Polikarp Antoni Augustyn Marciejewski O.P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 88
  • fn: CB, 24 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Sep 2014