Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Elias Mapunda

Bishop of Singida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1964 BornMango
23 Nov 199733.1Ordained PriestPriest of Singida, Tanzania
28 Apr 201550.5AppointedBishop of Singida, Tanzania
5 Jul 201550.7Ordained BishopBishop of Singida, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Edward Elias Mapunda:
Bishop Edward Elias Mapunda (born ) Bishop of Singida

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Singida.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Apr 2015
  • ob: CB, 12 Jun 2015
  • c12: CB, 6 Jul 2015
  • c34: CB, 7 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,540

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015