Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Mani

Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1936 BornRufina
12 Mar 196023.7Ordained PriestPriest of Fiesole, Italy
29 Oct 198751.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
29 Oct 198751.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaba
7 Dec 198751.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaba
31 Jan 199659.6AppointedArchbishop of Italy, Military
31 Jan 199659.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Zaba
7 Mar 199861.7ResignedTitular Archbishop of Zaba
20 Jun 200366.9AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
6 Sep 200367.2InstalledArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
25 Feb 201275.6RetiredArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Mani:
Archbishop Giuseppe Mani (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cagliari.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,910
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014