Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Malla Call

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lleida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1922Born
19 Dec 194826.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 196845.8AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
27 Oct 196846.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
29 Oct 199977.1RetiredBishop of Lleida, Spain
18 Apr 201491.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Lleida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Malla Call
Bishop Ramón Malla Call (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lleida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Seu d'Urgell
Ordained BishopLérida, Diocese of Lérida

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: CB, 18 Apr 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast