Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Deig Clotet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Solsona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1926BornNavas
16 Apr 194923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Solsona, Spain
20 Sep 197751.5AppointedBishop of Menorca, Spain
5 Nov 197751.7Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
7 Mar 199064.0AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
28 Jul 200175.4RetiredBishop of Solsona, Spain
12 Aug 200377.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Solsona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Deig Clotet:
Bishop Antonio Deig Clotet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Solsona

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013