Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrogio Onorato Luddi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Assisi

Titular Bishop of Troas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1841BornRaggiolo
1865¹23.8Ordained PriestPriest
1870¹28.8ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Feb 190564.0AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
30 Apr 190564.1Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
22 Dec 192786.8RetiredBishop of Assisi, Italy
22 Dec 192786.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
24 Mar 193089.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Assisi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Onorato Luddi:
Bishop Ambrogio Onorato Luddi O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Assisi

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013