Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Moretti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terni e Narni, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1851Born
11 Dec 190554.2AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
11 Dec 190554.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Terni, Italy
31 Dec 190554.2Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
12 Apr 190755.5AppointedBishop of Terni e Narni, Italy
7 Mar 192169.4ResignedBishop of Terni e Narni, Italy
7 Mar 192169.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria
30 Dec 192675.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Terni e Narni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Moretti
Archbishop Francesco Moretti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Terni e Narni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSelciaia

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,905, Number 58
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast