Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Jacques Guérard, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Castoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1761BornHottot-les-Bagues, France
25 Feb 178625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rouen, France
11 Dec 178928.9ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 May 181655.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
23 May 181655.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
25 Jul 181655.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
18 Jun 182362.4DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jacques Guérard:
Bishop Jean-Jacques Guérard M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013