Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles La Mothe, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Castoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1751BornSens, France
5 Feb 179342.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
5 Feb 179342.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
10 Apr 179645.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
22 May 181665.4DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Charles La Mothe:
Bishop Charles La Mothe M.E.P. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013