Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Julio López Hurtado, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Girardot, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1941 Born
29 Jan 195816.5ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Jun 196826.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Dec 198746.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ariari, Colombia
15 Dec 198746.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Elicroca
27 Feb 198846.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elicroca
29 Oct 199958.2AppointedBishop of Granada en Colombia
15 Jun 200159.8AppointedBishop of Girardot, Colombia
11 Jul 201876.9RetiredBishop of Girardot, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Héctor Julio López Hurtado
Bishop Héctor Julio López Hurtado S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Girardot

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTunja
Ordained BishopN.S. del Carmen, Granada, Vicariate Apostolic of Ariari

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Girardot.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,613
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jul 2018

Quantcast