Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Castelli

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1688³BornTerni
9 Jul 172436.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Jul 172436.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 172436.2AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
21 Sep 172436.2Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
31 Dec 173345.5DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Castelli:
Bishop Bartolomeo Castelli (born , died ) Bishop of Senigallia

  • a priest for 9.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1724, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015