Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Da Ponte, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Paolo de San Giovanni Crisostomo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1709Born
19 Sep 173324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
5 Aug 176556.1AppointedArchbishop of Corfù, Greece
11 Aug 176556.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corfù, Greece
14 Aug 177364.1SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Torcello (Turris), Italy
13 Sep 177364.2ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Torcello (Turris), Italy
Mar 1792³82.7DiedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Da Ponte
Archbishop Paolo Da Ponte O.C.D. (born , died Mar 1792) Bishop of Torcello (Turris)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 182, and Page 410
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast