Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rogelio Ricardo Livieres Plano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad del Este, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1945Born
15 Aug 197832.9Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
12 Jul 200458.8AppointedBishop of Ciudad del Este, Paraguay
3 Oct 200459.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad del Este, Paraguay
25 Sep 201469.0RemovedBishop of Ciudad del Este, Paraguay
14 Aug 201569.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ciudad del Este, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Rogelio Ricardo Livieres Plano
Bishop Rogelio Ricardo Livieres Plano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad del Este

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorrientes, Argentina

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,701
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Sep 2014
  • d: CB, 14 Aug 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018