Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Nepomuceno de Lera y Cano

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1754BornPeñas de San Pedro
18 Sep 181460.6SelectedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
19 Dec 181460.8ConfirmedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
19 Feb 181561.0Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
18 Apr 182874.1SelectedBishop of Segovia, Spain
23 Jun 182874.3ConfirmedBishop of Segovia, Spain
23 Jan 183176.9DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Nepomuceno de Lera y Cano:
Bishop Juan Nepomuceno de Lera y Cano (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 104, and Page 340
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 130, Number 695

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013