Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Ramón Roda

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1752BornOntiñena
5 Sep 181461.9SelectedBishop of León, Spain
19 Dec 181462.2ConfirmedBishop of León, Spain
26 Feb 181562.4Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
4 Jan 182370.2DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Ramón Roda:
Bishop Ignacio Ramón Roda (born , died ) Bishop of León

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 130, Number 699

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013