Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Castellón y Salas

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1756BornPonzano
1784¹27.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 181558.7AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
9 Jun 181659.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
20 Apr 183578.5DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Castellón y Salas:
Bishop Jerónimo Castellón y Salas (born , died ) Bishop of Tarazona

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 18
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 371
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 133, Number 715

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015