Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel del Villar

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1776³BornPamplona
4 Sep 181539.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lérida, Spain
4 Sep 181539.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
3 Dec 181539.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
23 Sep 181640.6AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
31 Aug 181741.6DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel del Villar:
Bishop Manuel del Villar (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 222, and Page 371
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 133, Number 713

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013