Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pier Francesco Cardinal Meglia

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to France

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1810Born
24 Sep 183625.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 186453.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
25 Sep 186453.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
1 Oct 186453.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to México
21 Oct 186655.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
27 Apr 187463.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
19 Sep 187968.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Sep 187968.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
27 Feb 188069.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
31 Mar 188372.4DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to France

MicroData Summary for Pier Francesco Meglia (VIAF: 10672982)
Pier Francesco Cardinal Meglia (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of France

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanto Stefano al Mare, Diocese of Ventimiglia, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Cemetery, Santo Stefano al Mare, Diocese of Ventimiglia, Italy

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
  • a cardinal for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 238, and Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1879
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 28
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 56, and Page 128, and Page 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast