Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gil Cardinal Carrillo de Albornoz

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Taranto

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1579²BornTalavera de la Reina, Spain
30 Aug 162748.7Elevated to Cardinal
12 Aug 163051.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
23 Sep 163051.7AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
6 Oct 163051.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
30 Mar 163758.2ResignedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
2 Aug 164364.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
19 Dec 164971.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Taranto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gil Carrillo de Albornoz:
Cardinal Gil Carrillo de Albornoz (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Taranto

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
  • a cardinal for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Aug 1627
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 21, and Page 327
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 153, Number 969

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014