Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pompée de Periglio, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Apt, France


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jan 1588AppointedBishop of Apt, France
24 Apr 1588Ordained BishopBishop of Apt, France
28 Jan 1607DiedBishop of Apt, France

MicroData Summary for Pompée de Periglio
Bishop Pompée de Periglio O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Apt

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCordeliers, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceApt, Diocese of Apt

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018