Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Donnauld

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Mirepoix

Titular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹BornS. Ybars
8 Nov 161032.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mirepoix, France
8 Nov 161032.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
21 Nov 161032.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
14 Jul 162143.5DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Mirepoix, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Donnauld:
Bishop Pierre de Donnauld (died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Mirepoix

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 345, and Page 245
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 49, Number 267
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015