Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis María de Larrea y Legarreta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bilbao, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1918Born
27 Jun 194325.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 197153.2AppointedBishop of León, Spain
25 Sep 197153.4Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
16 Feb 197960.8AppointedBishop of Bilbao, Spain
8 Sep 199577.3RetiredBishop of Bilbao, Spain
27 May 200991.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Bilbao, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis María de Larrea y Legarreta
Bishop Luis María de Larrea y Legarreta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bilbao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiravalles

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018