Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Lancaster (or Alencaster) Norona

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1721AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
7 Sep 1721Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
31 Oct 1733DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Lancaster (or Alencaster) Norona:
Bishop Juan Lancaster (or Alencaster) Norona (died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 39, Number 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013