Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armand de Monchy d’Hocquincourt

Deceased

Bishop of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹BornRoye
24 Jul 166527.5SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
27 Feb 166830.1ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
6 May 166830.3Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
29 Oct 167941.8DiedBishop of Verdun, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Armand de Monchy d’Hocquincourt:
Bishop Armand de Monchy d’Hocquincourt (died ) Bishop of Verdun

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 416
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015