Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás La Iglesia España

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1763Born
27 Oct 182460.8SelectedBishop of Zamora, Spain
20 Dec 182460.9ConfirmedBishop of Zamora, Spain
20 Feb 182561.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
20 May 183470.4DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás La Iglesia España
Bishop Tomás La Iglesia España (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuencivil

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 402
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 142, Number 769
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,825, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast