Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Manso

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1796Born
12 Sep 184750.8SelectedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
17 Dec 184751.1ConfirmedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
5 Mar 184851.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
17 Feb 185154.3AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
28 Dec 186266.1DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Manso (VIAF: 305418943)
Bishop Rafael Manso (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillamayor de Campos
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palencia, Diocese of Palencia

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 360, and Page 601
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 153, Number 835
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast