Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles de Rosmadec

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours, France


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Apr 1647SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
1 Jul 1647ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
6 Oct 1647Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
28 Jan 1671SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
22 Jun 1671ResignedBishop of Vannes, France
8 Feb 1672ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
23 Jul 1672DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Charles de Rosmadec
Archbishop Charles de Rosmadec (died ) Archbishop of Tours

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVannes, Diocese of Vannes

  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 395
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 362
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast