Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel-Louis de Baradat

Deceased

Bishop of Vabres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1640Born
8 Mar 166424.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 167333.0SelectedBishop of Vabres, France
12 Jun 167333.4ConfirmedBishop of Vabres, France
31 Dec 167333.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vabres, France
17 Mar 171070.1DiedBishop of Vabres, France

MicroData Summary for Daniel-Louis de Baradat
Bishop Daniel-Louis de Baradat (born , died ) Bishop of Vabres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChampagne

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 401
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,673, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast