Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent de Paul Kwanga Njubu

Bishop of Manono, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1956 Born
31 Aug 198529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kongolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Mar 200549.1AppointedBishop of Manono, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Jun 200549.4Ordained BishopBishop of Manono, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Vincent de Paul Kwanga Njubu
Bishop Vincent de Paul Kwanga Njubu (born ) Bishop of Manono

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Manono.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,899

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018