Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christian George Nicolas Kratz

Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

Titular Bishop of Themisonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1953 BornStrasbourg
25 Jun 197825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
18 Dec 200047.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
18 Dec 200047.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Themisonium
14 Jan 200147.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themisonium

MicroData Summary for Christian George Nicolas Kratz:
Bishop Christian George Nicolas Kratz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Strasbourg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,886

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015