Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdynand Ciechanowski, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1759Born
18 Jul 181050.7AppointedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
8 Oct 181050.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
7 Apr 182868.4DiedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Ferdynand Ciechanowski:
Bishop Ferdynand Ciechanowski O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Chełm

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1810, Number 8
  • bd/ab/ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,900
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 148
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015