Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo František (Franz) von Königsegg-Rothenfels

Deceased

Bishop of Litoměřice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1660BornWien
11 Apr 170544.9Ordained PriestPriest of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
6 Aug 170949.2SelectedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
26 Jan 171150.7ConfirmedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
7 Jun 171151.0Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
6 Sep 172060.3DiedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Hugo František (Franz) von Königsegg-Rothenfels:
Bishop Hugo František (Franz) von Königsegg-Rothenfels (born , died ) Bishop of Litoměřice

  • a priest for 15.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015