Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jozef Kluch

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1748BornZnióváralja
8 Jun 177022.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Apr 177123.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 180860.1SelectedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
11 Jul 180860.3ConfirmedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
28 Aug 180860.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
31 Dec 182678.8DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Jozef Kluch:
Bishop Jozef Kluch (born , died ) Bishop of Nitra

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013