Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Kiredjian

Deceased

Archbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1895Born
20 Apr 191923.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 193640.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
2 Mar 193640.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cypsela
28 Mar 193640.4SucceededArchbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
28 Feb 193741.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
20 Apr 196569.5DiedArchbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Paul Kiredjian
Archbishop Paul Kiredjian (born , died ) Archbishop of Istanbul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSis

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast