Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikasius Kipengele

Deceased

Bishop of Mahenge, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1923Born
24 Aug 195835.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 197047.4AppointedBishop of Mahenge, Tanzania
22 Sep 197047.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mahenge, Tanzania
7 Dec 197148.9DiedBishop of Mahenge, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Nikasius Kipengele
Bishop Nikasius Kipengele (born 1923, died ) Bishop of Mahenge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKipatimu

  • a priest for 13.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast