Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Toufik Khoury

Bishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1970 Born
1998²27.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria
14 Apr 199929.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria
17 Jun 201949.3AppointedBishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Aug 201949.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for George Toufik Khoury
Bishop George Toufik Khoury (born ) Bishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSafita, Syria
Ordained BishopSafita, Syria

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jun 2019
  • bd/op/c01: CB, 17 Jun 2019
  • ob: CB, 3 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 Aug 2019

Quantcast