Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Kaiser Depel, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Caravelí

Titular Bishop of Berrhoea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1903BornDülmen, Germany
10 Aug 193229.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
21 Nov 195754.5AppointedPrelate of Caravelí, Peru
29 Oct 196360.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Berrhoea
7 Dec 196360.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berrhoea
25 May 197168.0ResignedPrelate of Caravelí, Peru
26 Sep 199390.3DiedPrelate Emeritus of Caravelí, Peru

MicroData Summary for Federico Kaiser Depel:
Bishop Federico Kaiser Depel M.S.C. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Caravelí

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013