Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gheorghi Ivanov Jovčev

Bishop of Sofia e Plovdiv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1950 BornSekirovo Rakovski
9 May 197626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
6 Jul 198838.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
6 Jul 198838.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamphua
31 Jul 198838.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamphua
13 Nov 199545.5AppointedBishop of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Gheorghi Ivanov Jovčev:
Bishop Gheorghi Ivanov Jovčev (born ) Bishop of Sofia e Plovdiv

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sofia e Plovdiv.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,729
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 13 Feb 2014