Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopoldo Corpuz Jaucian, S.V.D.

Bishop of Bangued


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1960 BornSanta, Iloco Sur
7 Jun 198120.9ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
1 Mar 198827.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
5 Jan 200746.4AppointedBishop of Bangued, Philippines
26 Mar 200746.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bangued, Philippines
31 Mar 200746.7InstalledBishop of Bangued, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Corpuz Jaucian:
Bishop Leopoldo Corpuz Jaucian S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Bangued

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bangued.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+/i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,359

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013