Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Dominique Ithier, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Glandèves


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Apr 1654AppointedBishop of Glandèves, France
21 Jun 1654Ordained BishopBishop of Glandèves, France
12 Sep 1672DiedBishop of Glandèves, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Dominique Ithier:
Bishop Jean-Dominique Ithier O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Glandèves

  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015